THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:00:59 PM
Asif, Anjum
CPSO#:
91547
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905) 878-1562
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANJUM ASIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: April 19, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Anjum Asif was charged with the following offences:
1. Assault, between August 1, 2022 and August 31, 2022, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, on or about April 16, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: April 19, 2023
Place of Charge: Oakville, Ontario
Halton Regional Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: April 19, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Conditions of Release
On April 19, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Anjum Asif:
1. Asif must notify police of his address in writing within 24 hours prior to any change of address.
2. Asif must provide a fixed address of residence.
3. Asif must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with specified person except through legal counsel.
4. Asif must not be any place where he knows specified person lives, works, goes to school, frequents, or any place he knows specified person to be with specified exceptions.
5. Asif must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.