THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/05/23 19:34:30 PM
Purzner, James Gustav
CPSO#:
91517
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-666 Ext. 6282
Fax: 613-548-1346
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:17 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES GUSTAV PURZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURZNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2020 |