THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:55:57 AM
Jones, Kevin Charles
CPSO#:
91494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3A50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2014 |