THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:31:23 AM
ter Kuile, Sonia Ann
CPSO#:
91469
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2018 |