THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
10/12/23 6:20:43 AM
Khatoon, Salma
CPSO#:
91442
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
07 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Sind, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 03 May 2011 to 02 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 03 May 2012 to 02 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 03 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 2013 |