THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:47:16 PM
Sullovey, Amanda Joy
CPSO#:
91440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M4 Clinic M4 138
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5367
Fax: (416) 480-5616
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOY SULLOVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLOVEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2012 |