THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:16:49 AM
Guaiana, Giuseppe
CPSO#:
91426
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Milan, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2792
Fax: (519) 631-6497
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE GUAIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUAIANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2021 |