THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
21/09/23 4:25:24 AM
Maheshwari, Anil Kumar
CPSO#:
91425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR MAHESHWARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHESHWARI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2022 |