skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 0:50:05 AM

Tandon, Shruti

CPSO#: 91423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Copper Creek Drive Suite 205
Markham, ON
L6B 0P9
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: 905-472-9200
Fax: 905-472-9206 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

8333 Weston Road, #401
Woodbridge, ON
L4L 8E2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: 905-264-9991
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shruti Tandon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tandon ( CPSO# 91423 )

Business Address:
205-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-9200

Business Address:
401-8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 264-0022

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
406-1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHRUTI TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013