THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:36:01 AM
Wong, Sydney Sek Ning
CPSO#:
91371
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough, Ontario
M1P2T7
Scarborough ON M1P2T7
Phone: 4168400330
Fax: 4168400333
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYDNEY SEK NING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |