THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
21/09/23 5:04:30 AM
Anwar Masih, Tahreem Shawar
CPSO#:
91367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6884 14 TH AVE
Markham ON L6B 1A8
Phone: 905-554-1517
Fax: 905-554-2760
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAHREEM SHAWAR ANWAR MASIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWAR MASIH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2012 |