skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/08/21 9:37:12 AM

Singh, Jagdeep

CPSO#: 91325

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 91325 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010