skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 0:59:11 AM

Aliu-Berisha, Shpresa

CPSO#: 91307

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 752-0970
Fax: (519) 753-3988 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shalom Village
70 Macklin St.N.
Hamilton ON  L8S3S1
Canada
Phone: 9055291613
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shpresa Aliu-Berisha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aliu-Berisha ( CPSO# 91307 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
Shalom Village
70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton ON  L8S 3S1
Phone Number: (905) 529-1613

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHPRESA ALIU-BERISHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIU-BERISHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011