THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:29:56 PM
Maxwell, Jessica Elizabeth
CPSO#:
91270
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2016 |