skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 12:42:15 PM

Chadi, Ahmed Sami

CPSO#: 91254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion - 13-312A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-6769
Fax: 416-603-5936 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmed Sami Chadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chadi ( CPSO# 91254 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion - 13-312A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED SAMI CHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014