THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:05:49 PM
Chun, Soojin
CPSO#:
91247
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Division of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613-722-6521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOOJIN CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2016 |