THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:55:10 AM
Lotfy, Khaled Hany Abdelsalam
CPSO#:
91225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Nephrology
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: 519-663-3449
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALED HANY ABDELSALAM LOTFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOTFY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2018 |