skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 9:18:18 AM

Mirander, Lennox George

CPSO#: 91223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suit 35
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 7G8
Phone: 2892663100
Fax: 2897142646 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lennox Mirander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mirander ( CPSO# 91223 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LENNOX GEORGE MIRANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012