THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:48:11 PM
Vandermorris, Ashley Kate
CPSO#:
91222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Morris, Ashley Kate (used until: 26 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Harvard Medical School, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Adolescent Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6657
Fax: 4168135392
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Adolescent Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY KATE VANDERMORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMORRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2014 |