skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/10/22 17:52:30 PM

Panosyan, Francis Bartholomew

CPSO#: 91151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: 613-546-6652
Fax: 613-344-1365 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. FRANCIS B. PANOSYAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Panosyan ( CPSO# 91151 )

Business Address:
200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: 6135466652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCIS BARTHOLOMEW PANOSYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANOSYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2021