THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 8:35:53 AM
Fernandes, Nicole Dominica
CPSO#:
91116
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON L7S 1W7
Fax: 8889743170
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE DOMINICA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2014 |