skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 13:18:50 PM

Abdulla, Alym Nizar Hussein

CPSO#: 91110

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014