skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 4:16:19 AM

Spencer, Gilbert Todd

CPSO#: 91092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone: (705) 848-7181 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Todd Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Spencer ( CPSO# 91092 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 864-1520

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-0055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GILBERT TODD SPENCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011