THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:12:35 PM
Goodman, Ella Maye
CPSO#:
91076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NorWest Community Health Centres
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay ON P7C 3J6
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ella Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELLA MAYE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2011 |