THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:00:27 AM
Brockerville, Melissa Anne
CPSO#:
91068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St Johns NL A1B 3V6
Date Received: 08 Aug 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE BROCKERVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROCKERVILLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2018 |