Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 25, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Shevanta Daniel was charged with the following offence:
1. 4 counts of assault, between February 1, 2023 and July 14, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code.
2. 2 counts of sexual assault, between April 1, 2023 and July 14, 2023, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: July 21, 2023
Place of Charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 25, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On July 17, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Shevanta Daniel:
1. Daniel must notify specified police officer within 24 hours of any change to his address, phone number, or employment.
2. Daniel must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person.
3. Daniel must not go to any place where named person lives, works, attends school, worships, or happens to be as known to Daniel.
4. Daniel must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in his possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling him to acquire or possess them to police.