THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:57:31 AM
Bismil, Supuneet
CPSO#:
91045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Pune, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: 705-549-3181
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Supuneet Bismil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUPUNEET BISMIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |