skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/08/22 1:22:32 AM

Dao, Viet Cuong

CPSO#: 91036

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Poly Clinic
204 - 5460 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit #CRU 3
298 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
Phone: 905-482-8648
Fax: 905-482-8647
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 208
4125 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2
Canada
Phone: 416-546-0848
Fax: 416-546-1858
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

8300 York Regional Rd 27
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0R9
Canada
Phone: 289-657-8700
Fax: 905-605-1068
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

372 Highway 7 E
Unit 106B
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0C6
Canada
Phone: 289-637-1158
Fax: 289-637-3999
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dao ( CPSO# 91036 )

Business Address:
3-298 John Street
Markham ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 482-8648

Business Address:
Suite 208
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 546-0848

Business Address:
Toronto Poly Clinic
204-5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIET CUONG DAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Sep 2018
Summary:

On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Viet Cuong Dao committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Dao is a physician, practising in a Clinic in Toronto. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College on July 5, 2011. Dr. Dao has practised exclusively in chronic pain medicine since 2014.

Dr. Dao’s Comments of a Sexual Nature

Dr. Dao saw and treated Patient A on four occasions at the Clinic in January and February, 2017.

Patient A was referred to Dr. Dao for treatment of chronic pain, in particular, chronic back pain and fibromyalgia. On each of Patient A’s visits, Dr. Dao administered injections in Patient A’s lumbar spine, sacroiliac joints, sciatic nerves, and sacroiliac fascia and massaged numbing anesthetic into the sites of injection, during which Patient A’s bare buttocks were exposed.

At the first visit Patient A was accompanied by a friend. Dr. Dao commented to Patient A’s friend about a tattoo that Patient A has on her lower back. Patient A commented that she would not have gotten the tattoo on her lower back if she had known it was called a “tramp stamp”. Dr. Dao commented that it was a sexy place to put a tattoo.

At the second visit, which Patient A attended alone, Dr. Dao asked, when Patient A moaned from the pain of the injections, whether “it hurt”. Patient A confirmed it did. Dr. Dao then said: “It’s going to feel good.” Patient A responded by saying: “Yeah, it’s one of those things that feels good.” Dr. Dao commented it was “kind of like S&M” and asked: “Do you know what S&M is?” Patient A indicated she knew what it was, and Dr. Dao asked: “Do you like S&M?” At the third visit, which Patient A attended alone, Dr. Dao asked Patient A if she knew what a sugar daddy is. Patient A confirmed she did. Dr. Dao asked if sugar daddies take care of women’s children. Patient A responded: “Well, I guess if the mother’s taken care of, then I guess the kids are taken care of too.” Dr. Dao responded that that was true. Later at the same appointment, Dr. Dao asked her if she knew what a “rub and tug” is. Patient A indicated she did and commented: “You probably go there every day on your lunch hour, and that’s inappropriate, you shouldn’t be talking to me like that.” When Dr. Dao chuckled, Patient A told Dr. Dao that was enough, and got up and left.

At the fourth visit on February 13, 2017, Patient A attended with another friend. About ten minutes into this appointment, Dr. Dao asked: “So, the…rub and tug is for guys? Is anything equivalent like that for women?” Patient A responded she could not say, adding that she does not go to “those places.” Dr. Dao commented that he has two family friends who work as massage therapists and that they do not do “those things.”

Disposition

On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Dao's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months effective October 1, 2018.
- Dr. Dao attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Dao's certificate of registration:
- Dr. Dao will successfully complete one-on-one instruction in Communication Education by an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense, and shall provide proof of completion to the College;
- Dr. Dao will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and professionalism by obtaining an unconditional pass, at his own expense, or any alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. Dr. Dao will provide proof of completion to the College.

Practice Monitor
- Dr. Dao shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounters)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor").
- At all times, Dr. Dao shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:
- provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A" to the Order) to the College on at least a monthly basis;
- remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with all patients;
- carefully observe all of his Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations. Dr. Dao shall ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;
- refrain from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A", while observing Dr. Dao in all of his Professional Encounters with patients;
- maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Order as Appendix "B" (the "Log");
- initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log; and
- submit the on final Log to the College on a monthly basis.
- Dr. Dao, shall maintain an up to date copy of the Log, by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to make it available to the College upon request.
- Dr. Dao, shall inform the College of each and every location where he practises or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinics) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Locations”) within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

Posting a Sign
- Dr. Dao, shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" to the Order that states: "Dr. Viet Cuong Dao has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age,unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Viet Cuong Dao must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient.
Further information maybe found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
- Dr. Dao shall post a certified translations) in any languages) in which he provides services, of the sign described in section (vii), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C" to the Order.
- Dr. Dao shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, that he has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
- With respect to patients with whom Dr. Dao has appointments that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, Dr. Dao, shall ensure that each patient is directly notified, within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details of the restriction described in section 4(iii) above.
- The requirement to practise with a practice monitor as set out in clauses 4(iii)-(x) above, shall remain in place until the College has received proof of successful completion of the Communication Education and the PROBE course, as set out in 4(i) and (ii) above.
- Dr. Dao shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.
- Dr. Dao reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00.
- Dr. Dao pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 10, 2018 9:00 a.m.

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)