skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 8:58:38 AM

Bhanabhai, Hitesh Baldev

CPSO#: 91034

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Manitoulin Health Centre, 2120 Hwy 551, Mindemoya, ON P0P 1S0
Date Received: 14 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
EL - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015