THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:56:54 AM
Story, Eden Sarah
CPSO#:
91019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1600 Scott St
Office of Clinical Trial
Pharmaceutical Drugs Directorate, H
Ottawa ON K1Y 4N7
Phone: 6138583336
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDEN SARAH STORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |