THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:45:53 PM
Heller, Mariel Kupfert
CPSO#:
90965
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 636-2203
Fax: (647) 689-2199
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Adolescent Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIEL KUPFERT HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2014 |