THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:52:32 AM
Giffin, Meredith Vanessa
CPSO#:
90961
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON N1H 1B9
Phone: 519-265-7477
Fax: 519-265-6006
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEREDITH VANESSA GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 30 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 11 Nov 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 07 Apr 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2015 |