THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:15:57 AM
Doris, Nadine Moira
CPSO#:
90959
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 224-4440
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:09 Mar 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE MOIRA DORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |