THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:18:02 AM
Chuhan, Yadwinder Singh
CPSO#:
90957
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Mental Health Services
2 Field Ambulance Medical Clinic
258 Somme road building N-111
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Phone: 6136875511 Ext. 242-4100
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 18, 2018, Kingston Health Science Centre has been informed by Queen's University that Dr. Chuhan's suspension in the Psychiatry Residency Program has ended. Therefore, KHSC reinstated Dr. Chuhan's hospital privileges.
On May 23, 2018, the College was notified by Kingston Health Science Centre (KHSC) that Queen's University suspended Dr. Chuhan from their residency Psychiatry Program. Therefore, KHSC temporarily suspended Dr. Chuhan's hospital privileges.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Nov 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH CHUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 07 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 08 Jul 2018 to 23 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 24 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 24 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 19 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |