skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/05/22 5:58:58 AM

Bohemier, Valerie Renelle Marie

CPSO#: 90950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 boulevard de l'Hopital
suite 220
Gatineau J8T 7X6
Phone: 819-303-1059
Fax: 8195686508

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Spring street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

909 boulevard de la Vérendrye Ouest
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

155 Rue Maclaren E
Gatineau QC  J8L 0C2
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valerie Bohemier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bohemier ( CPSO# 90950 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VALERIE RENELLE MARIE BOHEMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHEMIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014