THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:17:31 PM
Blanchette, Phillip Stanley
CPSO#:
90949
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Division of Medical Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8640
Fax: 519-685-8624
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILLIP STANLEY BLANCHETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2014 |