skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 22:57:03 PM

Abdallah, Faraj Wahib

CPSO#: 90886

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology
and Pain Medicine
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 71887 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, Room 1-026 Shuter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5071
Fax: 416-864-6014
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St,
North York, ON M2K 1E1
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-278-5683
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. F. Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdallah ( CPSO# 90886 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
University of Toronto
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
580 Harwood Ave S, Ajax, ON L1S 2J4
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: 905-683-2320

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2019 Active
             Dr. Faraj Wahib Abdallah may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.