THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:32:55 AM
Zaki, Anne Marie
CPSO#:
90831
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: George Washington University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9127 W. Thunderbird Rd Suite 104
Peoria AZ 85381
United States
Phone: (623) 972-2158
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:10 Jun 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
|
Active |