THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:39:47 AM
Cheung, Roderick Ting Fung
CPSO#:
90774
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
142-C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H6
Phone: (705) 371-2220 Ext. 6055
Fax: (855) 904-3697
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RODERICK TING FUNG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |