THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:10:40 PM
Smith, Shane Alexander
CPSO#:
90755
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
399 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shane Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANE ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2014 |