THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:40:42 PM
Doyle, Patricia Anne
CPSO#:
90748
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 1402
1465 Brenton Street
Halifax, NS B3J 3T3
Date Received: 13 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |