skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 4:00:16 AM

Nguyen, John Tien-Hao

CPSO#: 90743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CDU 5 4th Floor, CAF Clinic
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K0T2
Phone: 613 945 9011 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 109
15 Capella Ct
Ottawa ON  K2E7X1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nguyen ( CPSO# 90743 )

Business Address:
1160 Beaverwood Road
Suite 2
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone Number: (613) 692-0244

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1111

Medical Records Location

Address: I am transferring care of my practice to Dr. Jonathan Saper 2019/07/02. Dr. Saper and I have signed a records transfer agreement and he has agreed to take custodial ship of my records.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN TIEN-HAO NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011