THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:45:05 AM
Leung, James Sze-Chuck
CPSO#:
90741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Calgary, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre, Room 2R104
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street W
Hamilton, ON L8S4K1
Hamilton ON L8N 4K1
Phone: (905)521-2100 Ext. 75155
Fax: 905-570-8992
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES SZE-CHUCK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2015 |