skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 3:55:37 AM

Hwang, Irene I Lan

CPSO#: 90738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON  L4J0A7
Phone: 9057717755
Fax: 9057717752 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hwang ( CPSO# 90738 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755

Business Address:
30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
31 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON  L4J A7
Phone Number: 9057717755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRENE I LAN HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012