THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:39:50 PM
Doucet, Katie Margaret
CPSO#:
90737
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Giles, Katie Margaret (used until: 13 Jan 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402 - 327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
Phone: (705) 775-3379
Fax: (705) 775-5927
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Jan 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATIE MARGARET DOUCET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCET is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |