THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:26:28 PM
Patel, Sanjay Maganbhai
CPSO#:
90723
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJAY MAGANBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2013 |