THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:37:02 AM
Lelli, Megan Anne
CPSO#:
90722
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:University of Ottawa Health Science
801 King Edward (N203)
Ottawa, Ontario
K1N 6N5
Tel: 613-564-3950
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 09 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |