THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:21:49 PM
Yip, Amelia Ming Ching
CPSO#:
90717
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
206 - 430 Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 416
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMELIA MING CHING YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2015 to 21 Aug 2015
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 22 Aug 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2016 |