THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:21:48 PM
Eid, Moustafa Reyad Ibrahim
CPSO#:
90712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Tanta University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Front Avenue W
Brockville ON K6V 4J2
Phone: (613) 342-2262 Ext. 5362
Fax: (613) 342-2435
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA REYAD IBRAHIM EID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |