skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 3:50:09 AM

MacMillan, Thomas Evan

CPSO#: 90690

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8 - 415
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 340-3155 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richardson ( CPSO# 29524 )
Dr. T. MacMillan ( CPSO# 90690 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8- 415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS EVAN MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013